THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 9:03:39 AM
AlQahtani, Saad Qaddah S
CPSO#:
88198
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
11 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Jun 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: King Khalid University College of Medici, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: AlQahtani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 20 2015
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Suite 1102, 38 Grenville Street, Toronto, ON M4Y 1A5
Date Received: 10 Jun 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2008 to 23 Jun 2008
PEAP - R - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 24 Jun 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Plastic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
CF - Plastic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Jun 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2013 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 11 Jun 2015 |