THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 3:09:36 AM
Abdalla, Mohamed Ali Abdulrehman
CPSO#:
88196
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Nov 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
30 Nov 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Swahili
Education: University of Nairobi, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Tillsonburg District Memorial
Hospital
Department of Medicine
167 Rolph Street
Tillsonburg ON N4G 3Y9
Phone: (519) 842-3611 Ext. 5232
Fax: (519) 842-7008
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Alexandra Hospital |
Ingersoll |
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital |
Tillsonburg |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Nov 2011 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Critical Care Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Mar 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 Nov 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Aug 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Aug 2013 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Aug 2013 |
|
Active |