THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 9:27:15 AM
Eder, Lihi
CPSO#:
88185
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jan 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Jan 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hebrew
Education: Ben-Gurion University of the Negev Facul, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Women's College Hospital
Department of Rheumatology
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON M5S 1B1
Phone: (416) 323-6344 Ext. 5108
Fax: (416) 323-6115
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Israel
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Women's College Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Rheumatology |
Effective:01 Jan 2016 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2008 to 10 Jun 2008
PEAP - CF - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 11 Jun 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Aug 2011
CF - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
CF - Rheumatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Mar 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Mar 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Aug 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 May 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Dec 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Feb 2022 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Feb 2022 |
|
Active |