THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 23:31:35 PM
Comondore, Vikram Ravindran
CPSO#:
88184
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jul 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Tamil
Education: McMaster University, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 308
2250 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON L6R 0W3
Phone: (905) 595-2870
Fax: (905) 595-2869
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Toronto East Health Network |
Toronto |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:04 Oct 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VIKRAM RAVINDRAN COMONDORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COMONDORE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 02 Apr 2008 to 30 Apr 2008
EL - Respirology
University of Toronto, 01 May 2008 to 31 May 2008
EL - Respiratory Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Aug 2008 to 31 Aug 2008
EL - Respirology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Respiratory Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Apr 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 May 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jul 2010 |