THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 4:56:22 AM
Makanjee, Bhavanesh
CPSO#:
88173
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Mar 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Aug 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Natal, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 412
1371 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON M1B 4Z8
Phone: (416) 281-9499
Fax: (416) 283-5705
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site |
Ajax |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:09 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:19 Sep 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BHAVANESH MAKANJEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAKANJEE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Mar 2008 to 28 May 2008
PEAP - CF - Adult Cardiac Electrophysiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 29 May 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Adult Cardiac Electrophysiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Adult Cardiac Electrophysiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Adult Cardiac Electrophysiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 09 Jul 2010
CF - Adult Cardiac Electrophysiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 18 Mar 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 29 May 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Aug 2009 |