THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 7:53:56 AM
Advani, Andrew
CPSO#:
88172
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Apr 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Edinburgh, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
Dept of Endocrinology & Metabolism
Room 6 151
61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON M5C 2T2
Phone: (416) 864-6060 Ext. 8413
Fax: (416) 867-3696
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Endocrinology and Metabolism |
Effective:01 Apr 2008 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 2008 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Apr 2008 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Apr 2011 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 18 Jun 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Mar 2024 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Mar 2024 |
|
Active |