THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 6:41:44 AM
Dhillon, Rajwinder Singh
CPSO#:
88162
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Nov 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Nov 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: Eugenio Maria De Hostos University, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 102
4383 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON L2E 6A6
Phone: (289) 296-6194
Fax: (289) 296-4519
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System |
Niagara Falls |
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site |
St Catharines |
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay |
Thunder Bay |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:02 May 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Rheumatology |
Effective:15 Oct 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RAJWINDER SINGH DHILLON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHILLON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 03 Mar 2008 to 30 Apr 2008
EL - Rheumatology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 May 2008 to 30 May 2008
EL - Rheumatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Mar 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 May 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Nov 2009 |