THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 3:37:27 AM
Nicolas, Valerie Gisele Andree
CPSO#:
88153
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
24 Nov 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
04 Nov 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Le Foll, Valerie Gisele Andree (used until: 14 Sep 2010 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
French
Education: Universite De Nantes, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 11 Mar 2008 to 02 Jun 2008
PEAP - CF - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 03 Jun 2008 to 28 May 2009
CF - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2010 to 24 Nov 2010
CF - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 11 Mar 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jun 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 May 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Nov 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 24 Nov 2010 |