THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 16:39:03 PM
Khan, Rajal Yusuf
CPSO#:
88152
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
30 Sep 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
31 Aug 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: Queen's University, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:08 May 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 10 Mar 2008 to 04 Apr 2008
EL - Gastroenterology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 09 Mar 2009 to 05 Apr 2009
EL - Gastroenterology
McMaster University, 31 Aug 2009 to 30 Sep 2009
EL - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Mar 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 04 Apr 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Mar 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 05 Apr 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 31 Aug 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2009 |