THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 22:14:08 PM
Bokhary, Manal Ismail Ibrahem
CPSO#:
88151
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
27 Nov 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
25 Nov 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: King Abdul Aziz University, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:07 May 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:27 Nov 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 17 Mar 2008 to 15 May 2008
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 28 Nov 2011 to 27 Nov 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology
University of Ottawa, 28 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 27 Nov 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology
University of Ottawa, 28 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Gastroenterology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 27 Nov 2014
CF - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 17 Mar 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 May 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Aug 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Nov 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Nov 2014 |