THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 16:12:35 PM
Amir, Mohammad Faisal
CPSO#:
88145
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of
14 Sep 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
15 Sep 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: University of Peshawar, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Mohammad Faisal Amir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 10 2018
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Pakistan
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 10 Mar 2008 to 01 Jun 2008
AVP - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 02 Jun 2008 to 09 Mar 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 10 Mar 2009 to 09 Mar 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 10 Mar 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jun 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Mar 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Sep 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Dec 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Sep 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Feb 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Sep 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Sep 2017 |