THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 7:10:23 AM
Alves, Cristina Marta Da Gama Gomes
CPSO#:
88125
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of
30 Jun 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Mar 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Coimbra, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2008 to 16 Apr 2008
PEAP - CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 17 Apr 2008 to 15 Apr 2009
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 16 Apr 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Apr 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Mar 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2011 |