THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 11:51:16 AM
Kargbo, Natalia Vladimirovna
CPSO#:
88121
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Feb 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Feb 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Russian
Education: International University of the Health S, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6B 0A8
Phone: (705)759-3434 Ext. 5352
Electoral District: 08
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Natalia Kargbo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Espanola General Hospital |
Espanola |
Manitoulin Health Centre |
Little Current |
North Shore Health Network |
Blind River |
Sault Area Hospital |
Sault Ste. Marie |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NATALIA VLADIMIROVNA KARGBO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KARGBO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 10 Mar 2008 to 01 Jun 2008
AVP - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 02 Jun 2008 to 09 Mar 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 10 Mar 2009 to 09 Mar 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 10 Mar 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jun 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Mar 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 12 Aug 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Feb 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Feb 2011 |