THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/03/24 3:54:27 AM
Farag, Ashraf Mohamed Dakhil
CPSO#:
88110
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Apr 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Apr 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicin, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
1030 Ouellette Ave
Windsor ON N9A 1E1
Phone: 5192545577
Electoral District: 01
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sault Area Hospital |
Sault Ste. Marie |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:10 Oct 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ASHRAF MOHAMED DAKHIL FARAG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARAG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 06 Mar 2008 to 02 Apr 2008
EL - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Mar 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 Apr 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Apr 2012 |