THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 8:13:54 AM
Taheri-Anaraki, Atousa
CPSO#:
88092
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Mar 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Mar 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: Islamic Azad University, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2900 Steeles Ave E
Thornhill ON L3T 4X1
Phone: 905-881-6667
Fax: 905-731-1298
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:22 Feb 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ATOUSA TAHERI-ANARAKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAHERI-ANARAKI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Mar 2008 to 23 May 2008
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 May 2008 to 28 Feb 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Mar 2009 to 28 Feb 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 May 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Feb 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Mar 2010 |