THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
17/04/24 22:04:15 PM
MacKay, Rebecca Ellyn
CPSO#:
88083
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
29 Feb 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
02 Sep 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:21 Oct 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 19 Feb 2008 to 07 Mar 2008
EL - Hematology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 14 Jul 2008 to 25 Jul 2008
EL - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2011 to 29 Feb 2012
CF - Hematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Feb 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 07 Mar 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 25 Jul 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Sep 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Feb 2012 |