THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 4:41:56 AM
Chin, Vannessa Marsha
CPSO#:
88071
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Jan 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
29 Jan 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of the West Indies, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Anesthesia
and Pain Medicine
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7654 Ext. 207449
Fax: (416) 813-7543
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Jamaica
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:28 Oct 2022 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 04 Feb 2008 to 18 Feb 2008
PEAP - R - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 19 Feb 2008 to 04 May 2008
EL - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 16 Sep 2009
PEAP - CF - Paediatric Critical Care
University of Toronto, 17 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Paediatric Critical Care
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 01 Sep 2014
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 01 Sep 2015
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2016 to 29 Jan 2016
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 05 Feb 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Feb 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 04 May 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Sep 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 May 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Sep 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Jan 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 29 Jan 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Mar 2022 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Oct 2022 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Oct 2022 |
|
Active |