THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 2:22:55 AM
Haroon, Nigil
CPSO#:
88065
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Feb 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Feb 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati, Hindi, Malayalam, Tamil
Education: University of Kerala, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
1E - 425
399 Bathurst St
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5634
Fax: (416) 603-4348
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Rheumatology |
Effective:20 Jun 2019 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 31 Jan 2008 to 23 Apr 2008
PEAP - CF - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 24 Apr 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jan 2012
CF - Rheumatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jan 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Apr 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Mar 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 09 Mar 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jan 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Feb 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Dec 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Jun 2019 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Jun 2019 |
|
Active |