THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 14:40:45 PM
Carr, Sean Adam
CPSO#:
88064
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Jun 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Jun 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 106
2100 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON M3N 2Z9
Phone: (416) 739-7558
Fax: (416) 736-4300
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:04 Oct 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SEAN ADAM CARR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 04 Feb 2008 to 02 Mar 2008
EL - Respiratory Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Feb 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 Mar 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jun 2011 |