THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 9:45:25 AM
McNaught, Andrew Fraser
CPSO#:
88015
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Jul 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of London, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
835 King St W
Kitchener ON N2G 1G3
Phone: 519-749-4300
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
St Mary's General Hospital |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:09 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANDREW FRASER MCNAUGHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCNAUGHT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 14 Jan 2008 to 29 Feb 2008
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jan 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 Mar 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Jul 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jul 2012 |