THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 8:27:20 AM
Pun, Teresa Wai Chong
CPSO#:
87998
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Oct 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Oct 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English, Mandarin
Education: University of Toronto, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Uptown Health Centre
243 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON M4R 1B1
Phone: (416) 489-2106
Fax: (416) 489-2981
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
Manitoba
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Clinical Immunology and Allergy |
Effective:20 Oct 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TERESA WAI CHONG PUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PUN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 14 Jan 2008 to 10 Feb 2008
EL - Infectious Diseases
University of Toronto, 06 Apr 2009 to 01 May 2009
EL - Clinical Immunology and Allergy
McMaster University, 03 Aug 2009 to 30 Aug 2009
EL - Clinical Immunology and Allergy
University of Toronto, 12 Jan 2012 to 08 Feb 2012
EL - Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jan 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 10 Feb 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Apr 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 May 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Aug 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Aug 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jan 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 08 Feb 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Oct 2012 |