THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 6:43:34 AM
Lambe, Shahid Abdul Razak
CPSO#:
87992
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Feb 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Feb 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi
Education: University of Mumbai, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
50 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Phone: 9055216014
Fax: 9052960436
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brant Community Healthcare System |
Brantford |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHAHID ABDUL RAZAK LAMBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAMBE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2008 to 14 Feb 2008
PEAP - CF - Urology
McMaster University, 15 Feb 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Urology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Urology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Urology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Urology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 26 Aug 2014
CF - Urology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jan 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Feb 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Jan 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 Jan 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Aug 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Aug 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Jun 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Apr 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Feb 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Feb 2018 |