THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 13:22:35 PM
Forero Mantilla, Carlos Mauricio
CPSO#:
87985
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Feb 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
17 Feb 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Universidad Industrial De Santander, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Healthcare Hamilton
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Phone: 9055221155 Ext. 33855
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:17 Feb 2010 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2008 to 14 Feb 2008
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 15 Feb 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jan 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Feb 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Dec 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 Feb 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Feb 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
|
Active |