THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 4:22:22 AM
Nuri, Khuloud Fahmi Khaled
CPSO#:
87950
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jan 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Sep 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicin, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
CAMBRIDGE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
700 CORONATION BLVD
CAMBRIDGE, ON
N1R 3G2
Cambridge ON N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 621-2333 Ext. 2349
Fax: (519) 740-4905
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cambridge Memorial Hospital |
Cambridge |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Medical Microbiology |
Effective:18 Sep 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Infectious Diseases |
Effective:23 Sep 2022 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KHULOUD FAHMI KHALED NURI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NURI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2008 to 20 Mar 2008
PEAP - R - Medical Microbiology
McMaster University, 21 Mar 2008 to 20 Mar 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Microbiology
McMaster University, 21 Mar 2009 to 20 Mar 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Microbiology
McMaster University, 21 Mar 2010 to 20 Mar 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Microbiology
McMaster University, 21 Mar 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Microbiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 18 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Microbiology
McMaster University, 19 Sep 2011 to 18 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Microbiology
McMaster University, 19 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Microbiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 18 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Microbiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Mar 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Sep 2013 |