THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 9:14:35 AM
Adly, Elaheh
CPSO#:
87945
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Jul 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anesthesia
McMaster University
HSC-2V9
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON L8S 4K1
Phone: 905-521-2100 Ext. 75166
Fax: 905-523-1224
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brant Community Healthcare System |
Brantford |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ELAHEH ADLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADLY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2008 to 20 Mar 2008
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
AVP - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 24 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Mar 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 2015 |