THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 6:04:36 AM
Yin, Yiqing
CPSO#:
87937
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
30 Jun 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
10 Jan 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: Tianjin Medical University, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2008 to 24 Mar 2008
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 25 Mar 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Mar 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jan 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2012 |