THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 12:55:58 PM
Yousef, Jakline Maher Yacoub
CPSO#:
87935
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jan 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Jul 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Mansoura University, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
M3M0B2
Toronto ON M6M 3Z4
Phone: (416) 2421000 Ext. 43099
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:31 Jul 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Geriatric Psychiatry |
Effective:21 Sep 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JAKLINE MAHER YACOUB YOUSEF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUSEF is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jul 2009 |