THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 11:25:03 AM
da Rosa Borges, Bruno Cesar
CPSO#:
87932
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Feb 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
14 Feb 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Portuguese
Education: Universidade Federal De Pernambuco, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University Medical Centre
Department of Anaesthesia
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON L8N 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75166
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Brazil
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Chedoke Hospital Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:01 Jul 2017 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2008 to 14 Mar 2008
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 15 Mar 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Mar 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Feb 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Mar 2018 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Mar 2018 |
|
Active |