THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 21:23:07 PM
Chung, Caroline
CPSO#:
87926
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
05 Jun 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
10 Sep 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Korean
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Caroline Chung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 30 2016
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Texas
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:30 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Jan 2008
EL - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Jul 2010
CF - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jan 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Sep 2010 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 05 Jun 2017 |