THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 9:00:21 AM
Azharuddin, Mohammed
CPSO#:
87913
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Jan 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Urdu
Education: Kakatiya Medical College, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
4265 Thomas Alton Blvd
RBM Medical Specialists
Unit 19
Burlington ON L7M 0Z4
Phone: 289 313 7476
Fax: 289 313 8158
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Endocrinology and Metabolism |
Effective:26 Sep 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MOHAMMED AZHARUDDIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AZHARUDDIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 02 Jan 2008 to 10 Mar 2008
PEAP - CF - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 11 Mar 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Sep 2008
AVP - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 24 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jan 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Mar 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2012 |