THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 9:45:23 AM
Makh, Dalbir Singh
CPSO#:
87890
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Sep 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Sep 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: University of London, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
NEMS Platform 1 Practice
Station Street
Nottingham NG2 3AJ
United Kingdom
Phone: 0115 916 6061
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:17 Jul 2018 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DALBIR SINGH MAKH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAKH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 20 Nov 2007 to 04 Dec 2007
PEAP - R - Trauma General Surgery
McMaster University, 05 Dec 2007 to 07 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Trauma General Surgery
McMaster University, 09 Nov 2009 to 23 Nov 2009
PEAP - R - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 20 Nov 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Dec 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 07 Dec 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 09 Nov 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Nov 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Sep 2018 |