THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 0:41:42 AM
Landy, Joshua Samuel
CPSO#:
87874
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Jun 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Scarborough Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 438-2911
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Joshua Landy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 23 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Sault Area Hospital |
Sault Ste. Marie |
Scarborough Health Network |
Toronto |
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:04 May 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:26 Sep 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOSHUA SAMUEL LANDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANDY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 26 Nov 2007 to 16 Dec 2007
EL - Infectious Diseases
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Nov 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Dec 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Apr 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 May 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jun 2011 |