THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 14:14:14 PM
Hollowell, Jill Suzanne
CPSO#:
87872
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Apr 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Apr 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Nova Southeastern University, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Preston Medical Centre
506 King Street East
Cambridge ON N3H 3N2
Phone: (519) 653-3321
Fax: (519) 653-3498
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cambridge Memorial Hospital |
Cambridge |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:11 Dec 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JILL SUZANNE HOLLOWELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOLLOWELL is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Nov 2007 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Nov 2007 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 01 Nov 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Nov 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Mar 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Apr 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Apr 2013 |