THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
17/04/24 14:43:03 PM
Shabana, Wael Mansour
CPSO#:
87867
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Nov 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
09 Nov 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, Dutch, English
Education: ZAGAZIG FACULTY OF MEDICINE, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital General Hospital
Department of Radiology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-6111
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nunavut
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Almonte General Hospital |
Almonte |
Arnprior Regional Health |
Arnprior |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
Renfrew Victoria Hospital |
Renfrew |
Winchester District Memorial Hospital |
Winchester |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:09 Nov 2007 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 09 Nov 2007 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Nov 2007 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 22 Aug 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Sep 2013 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 27 Sep 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Oct 2023 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Oct 2023 |
|
Active |