THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 19:52:37 PM
Aliu, Teuta
CPSO#:
87865
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Jan 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Jan 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Albanian, English
Education: UNIVERSITY OF PRISTINA, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Lincoln Medical Centre
4413 Ontario Street
Beamsville ON L0R 1B5
Phone: (905) 563-1212
Fax: (905) 563-4404
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:04 Jan 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TEUTA ALIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALIU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 20 Nov 2007 to 11 Feb 2008
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 12 Feb 2008 to 19 Nov 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 20 Nov 2008 to 19 Nov 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 20 Nov 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Feb 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Nov 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jan 2010 |