THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 11:05:36 AM
Wilejto, Marta
CPSO#:
87863
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital, LHSC
Div of Haematology and Oncology
800 Commissioners Rd E, Rm B1-115
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: 519-685-8500 Ext. 55113
Fax: 519-685-8384
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARTA WILEJTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILEJTO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 18 Nov 2008 to 12 Dec 2008
EL - Pediatric Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Nov 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Dec 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Nov 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Dec 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2010 |