THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 20:59:51 PM
de Montbrun, Sandra Lynn
CPSO#:
87856
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
314-3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 1M1
Phone: 905-901-1533
Fax: 905-901-1534
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hos,pital |
Milton |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital |
Georgetown |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SANDRA LYNN DE MONTBRUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE MONTBRUN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 05 Nov 2007 to 04 Jan 2008
EL - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Colorectal Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 7 - Colorectal Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 7 - Colorectal Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Nov 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 04 Jan 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2009 |