THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 4:09:18 AM
Mohamed Ally, Shamshaad Banu
CPSO#:
87849
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Mar 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Mar 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Afrikaans, English, Hindi, Urdu
Education: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON N7T 6S3
Phone: 519 464 4400
Fax: 519 464 4400
Electoral District: 01
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients seeking to obtain a copy of their medical record may fax their request to the attention of Ms. Kirstin Kurian at Alpha IT: Fax 416 449 8543 or call 416 449 2100
Date Received: 15 Dec 2015
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Bluewater Health |
Sarnia |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:06 Dec 2007 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHAMSHAAD BANU MOHAMED ALLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAMED ALLY is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 07 Nov 2007 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Nov 2007 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 18 Sep 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Mar 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Mar 2008 |