THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 1:48:26 AM
Greenway, Matthew John
CPSO#:
87825
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Dec 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Dec 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Montebello Medical Centre
118 Lake St
St Catharines ON L2R 5Y1
Phone: 905 685 6555
Fax: 905 685 6558
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:27 Oct 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MATTHEW JOHN GREENWAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREENWAY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Nov 2007 to 24 Jan 2008
AVP - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 25 Jan 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Nov 2008 to 31 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jan 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Oct 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Dec 2009 |