THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 9:12:15 AM
Roberts, Mark Steven
CPSO#:
87812
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Jan 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of London, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Perth & Smith's Falls District Hosp
33 Drummond Street West
Perth ON K7H 2K1
Phone: (613) 267-3232
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital |
Perth |
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site |
Smiths Falls |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARK STEVEN ROBERTS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBERTS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 19 Oct 2007 to 11 Jan 2008
AVP - Orthopedic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 12 Jan 2008 to 18 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 19 Oct 2008 to 02 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 03 Dec 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 19 Oct 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Jan 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jan 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2010 |