THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 17:21:59 PM
Ayala-Bustamante, Everick Narcy
CPSO#:
87808
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Jun 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Spanish
Education: Peruana Cayetano Heredia University, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:All radiology medical records are located at the hospitals, where patients were seen.
Date Received: 12 May 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:18 May 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 22 Oct 2007 to 16 Nov 2007
EL - Neuroradiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 28 Feb 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neuroradiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Oct 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Nov 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2010 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2014 |