THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 0:38:58 AM
Oketch, Consolata Anyango
CPSO#:
87776
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Oct 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Oct 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Swahili
Education: University of Nairobi, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Carea Community Health Centre
115 Grassmere Ave
Oshawa ON L1H 3X7
Phone: (905) 723-0036
Fax: (905) 723-3391
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:20 Oct 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CONSOLATA ANYANGO OKETCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OKETCH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 23 Oct 2007 to 07 Jan 2008
AVP - Community Medicine
Queen's University, 08 Jan 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 23 Oct 2008 to 19 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 23 Oct 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jan 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Oct 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Oct 2009 |