THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 23:01:36 PM
Hofer, Stefan Oliver Paul
CPSO#:
87771
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Oct 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
15 Jul 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Dutch, English, German
Education: University of Amsterdam, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Plastic Surgery
Suite 8N865
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3449
Fax: (416) 340-4403
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Netherlands
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Dryden Regional Health Centre |
Dryden |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:16 Oct 2014 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Oct 2007 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 2010 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Jul 2010 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 20 Sep 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Jun 2013 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 13 Sep 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Nov 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Oct 2014 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Oct 2014 |
|
Active |