THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 4:56:30 AM
Jailall, Davindra Naresh
CPSO#:
87767
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Oct 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Aug 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Ross University School of Medicine, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive E
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Phone: 9054942120 Ext. 57337
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Davindra Jailall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 29 2023
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:27 Jun 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVINDRA NARESH JAILALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAILALL is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Oct 2007 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Oct 2007 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 02 Oct 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Oct 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Oct 2008 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 Sep 2017 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 22 Sep 2017 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Aug 2019 |