THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 8:49:38 AM
Al-Anezi, Fahad Rifeed Marshed
CPSO#:
87708
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
20 Aug 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Sep 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: King Faisal University, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 10 Sep 2007 to 02 Dec 2007
PEAP - CF - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 03 Dec 2007 to 30 Aug 2008
CF - Ophthalmology
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Ophthalmology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Ophthalmology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Aug 2010
CF - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 13 Sep 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 Dec 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Dec 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Aug 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Aug 2010 |