THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 7:54:51 AM
Matisoff, Andrew Jeffrey
CPSO#:
87686
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Aug 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
09 Aug 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: University of Virginia, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Anaesthesia
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:09 Aug 2023 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 10 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Sep 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Sep 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 09 Aug 2023 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Aug 2023 |
|
Active |