THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 5:58:48 AM
Alsunbul, Waleed Abdulaziz
CPSO#:
87657
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 May 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 May 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Arabian Gulf University College of Medic, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
237 Barton St E
Hamilton General Hospital
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Phone: 365-833-7652
Fax: 289-212-6764
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurosurgery |
Effective:08 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. WALEED ABDULAZIZ ALSUNBUL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALSUNBUL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 29 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 30 Aug 2008 to 29 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 30 Aug 2009 to 29 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 30 Aug 2010 to 29 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 30 Aug 2011 to 29 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 30 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Aug 2014
CF - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Aug 2015
CF - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Mar 2017
CF - Neurosurgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Aug 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 07 Nov 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 07 Nov 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Nov 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Mar 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 Nov 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 09 Dec 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 2021 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 31 Dec 2021 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 May 2022 |