THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 10:50:47 AM
Kyanzadeh, Fareiborz
CPSO#:
87656
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Jan 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jan 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: Shiraz University, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
World On Yonge Medical Centre
Suite 207
7191 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON L3T 0C4
Phone: (905) 597-5919
Fax: (905) 597-5909
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:09 Dec 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. FAREIBORZ KYANZADEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KYANZADEH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 04 Sep 2007 to 26 Nov 2007
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 27 Nov 2007 to 03 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 04 Sep 2008 to 03 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 04 Sep 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Nov 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 03 Sep 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Sep 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Jan 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jan 2010 |