THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 2:24:42 AM
Monzon, Jose Gerard
CPSO#:
87654
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
11 Aug 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact:
Tom Baker Cancer Centre
1331 29th Street
North-West Calgary, Alberta
T2N 4N2
Date Received: 03 May 2013
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:27 Sep 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2007 to 30 Sep 2007
EL - Medical Oncology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
EL - Medical Oncology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Aug 2012
CF - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Aug 2010 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2013 |