THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 9:52:09 AM
Noor, Amra
CPSO#:
87644
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Sep 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Sep 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: University of the Punjab, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St .Joseph Health Centre
100 Westmount Street
Guelph ON N1H 5H8
Phone: (519) 824-6000 Ext. 4270
Fax: 519 767 3438
Electoral District: 03
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Virginia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Health Centre, Guelph |
Guelph |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:13 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Geriatric Medicine |
Effective:27 Sep 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AMRA NOOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOOR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 Aug 2007 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Aug 2007 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 26 Aug 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Jan 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Sep 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2008 |